THE HARRY TURNER ALMSHOUSES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision & maintenance of Almshouses in Macclesfield, Cheshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 13 October 1964: Standard registration
- THE HARRY TURNER ALMSHOUSES TRUST (Working name)
- HARRY TURNER ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN LEE PODMORE | Chair | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Diane Michelle Bennett | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Christine Sullivan | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Keith Podmore | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stuart Daglish | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEOFFREY GARRETT | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WOULDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.56k | £191.33k | £192.95k | £183.41k | £189.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.22k | £135.64k | £128.35k | £204.79k | £175.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS OVER 55 YEARS OF AGE, OR DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE
Area of benefit
WITHIN 16.1 KILOMETRES OF MACCLESFIELD TOWN HALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 Barbirolli Square
Manchester
M2 3BD
- Phone:
- 01618326221
- Email:
- mike@harryturnertrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window