THE PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 235924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Run Almshouses in Sutton Courtenay

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,222
Total expenditure: £10,558

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SUTTON COURTENAY CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNA FRANCES O'CALLAGHAN Trustee 24 April 2023
SUTTON COURTENAY (NATIONAL POWER) TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Patricia Budd Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Rev Helen Grace Kendrick Trustee 29 April 2019
CHARITY OF EDMUND BRADSTOCK FOR THE POOR (ESTATE CHARITY)
Received: On time
EDMUND BRADSTOCK FOR EDUCATION
Received: On time
RITA ATKINSON Trustee 25 November 2013
SUTTON COURTENAY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
SUTTON COURTENAY (NATIONAL POWER) TRUST
Received: On time
Ian David Hignell Trustee 20 September 2011
None on record
WILLIAM HANKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.40k £15.73k £15.96k £15.98k £16.22k
Total expenditure £12.61k £13.98k £15.76k £13.53k £10.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 OCTOBER 1953
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE ALMSHOUSES AND OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INMATES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SUTTON COURTNEY AS IN 1889
Registration history
  • 06 August 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE ORCHARD
MILL LANE
SUTTON COURTENAY
ABINGDON
OX14 4BE
Phone:
01235848667
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available