CHUDLEIGH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 235929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General help for those in need living in parish of Chudleigh.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,734
Total expenditure: £2,883

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHUDLEIGH UNITED CHARITIES (RELIEF IN NEED) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN COX Chair 11 June 2020
THE DEVON LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
PYNSENT'S EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Alex Sharp Trustee 12 May 2022
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael Leslie Mc Cormick Trustee 12 May 2022
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
STEWART FRANK SAPP Trustee 10 March 2022
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
AMII LOUISE SHELLEY Trustee 10 March 2022
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PAMELA EMMA TUCKETT Trustee 11 October 2021
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
AMANDA JANE BARNES Trustee 08 March 2021
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CARE AND SHARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BARBARA ANN CHISNALL Trustee 08 October 2020
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NICHOLAS WALTER Trustee 14 July 2020
CHUDLEIGH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.08k £2.30k £3.56k £2.02k £2.73k
Total expenditure £1.08k £2.04k £4.42k £2.09k £2.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36 Clifford Street
Chudleigh
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 0LE
Phone:
01626853261
Website:

None