Financial history THE SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 235967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.25k £23.65k £28.10k £25.24k £18.29k
Total expenditure £10.95k £20.99k £22.87k £30.57k £27.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A