FRIENDS OF ESSEX CHURCHES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The repair & restoration of Christian Churches in the area of the Diocese of Chelmsford, through grant giving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 23 March 1965: Standard registration
- 22 September 2021: Funds received from 213058 COLONEL J D SHERWOOD CHARITABLE TRUST
- FRIENDS OF ESSEX CHURCHES (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ESSEX CHURCHES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MARTIN STUCHFIELD | Chair | 13 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Peter John Tottman | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Jane Brice | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Guy Marsden | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Pimblett | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Francis James Archibald Bettley FSA | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
CATHERINE LEEDER | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Grainger | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JEREMY WILLIAM BEALE | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN EDWARD JUXON PICKTHORN | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.66k | £294.46k | £164.82k | £102.07k | £112.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.64k | £134.91k | £215.08k | £215.64k | £184.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 1983 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 1987 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND PLACES OF WORSHIP (HEREINAFTER CALLED "CHURCHES") IN THE AREA OF THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD; (B) TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CHURCHES IN THE AREA OF THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD. (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY MAY:- (A) COLLECT MONIES BY PUBLIC SUBSCRIPTION AND OTHERWISE TO ENABLE THE CHARITY TO MAKE GRANTS TO ASSIST CHURCHES IN THE CARRYING OUT OF REPAIRS, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE FABRIC OF CHURCHES, OR FOR RECORDING OR PUBLISHING THEIR HISTORY; (B) OFFER GUIDANCE TO CHURCHES AS TO HOW BEST TO MEET THEIR OBLIGATIONS AND TO PRODUCE LITERATURE TO THIS END; (C) UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER LIKE WORK OF A WHOLLY CHARITABLE NATURE, WHICH THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK RIGHT AND PROPER; PROVIDED THE CHARITY SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE REPAIR, DECORATION, FURNISHING OR RUNNING OF ANY CHURCH
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pentlow Hall
Pentlow
Essex
CO10 7SP
- Phone:
- 01787 281845
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window