Governing document THIRD CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON, ENGLAND
Charity number: 236065

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUN 1989 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 14 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2015 as amended on 13 Jun 2018 as amended on 14 Jul 2019 as amended on 31 Jan 2022 as amended on 27 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
GENERAL PURPOSES OF CHURCH
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NO PRECISE AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.