Financial history HIGH ONGAR RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 236100
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2010 28/05/2011 28/05/2012 28/05/2013 28/05/2014
Total gross income £16 £11 £14 £4 £3
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A