MILVERTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 236223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide services for the elderly and/or sick.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,870
Total expenditure: £1,478

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 1964: Standard registration
  • 21 August 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Ann Lawrence Trustee 10 November 2022
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET DINNING Trustee 19 November 2021
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
MOLLY BURTON Trustee 01 November 2011
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
MONRO MILNS PRISCOTT Trustee
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
DIANA SMITH Trustee
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev HELENE LINDSAY STAINER Trustee
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
ARTHUR HENRY JAMES WHITTLE Trustee
SHORTHORN SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
RACHEL RENFREE Trustee
BOUCHER AND BROADMEAD (MILVERTON) CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.22k £1.24k £1.24k £1.27k £2.87k
Total expenditure £850 £0 £1.50k £1.02k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 MARCH 1905
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF MILVERTON
Registration history
  • 13 August 1964 : Standard registration
  • 21 August 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Knutsford
North Street
Milverton
Taunton
TA4 1LG
Phone:
01823400365
Website:

No information available