SPAR CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING MONEY FOR MARIE CURIE SUPPORTS RETAIL INDUSTRY CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 April 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Jelfs | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Straiton | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Teague | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Drake | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Taylor Green | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cleary | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BOARDMAN | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stone | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saleem Sadiq | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Justin Peter Taylor | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Mcbride | Trustee | 28 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DODDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JOSEPH DOODY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/04/2020 | 28/04/2021 | 28/04/2022 | 28/04/2023 | 28/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £52.59k | £57.63k | £111.73k | £130.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.73k | £69.40k | £177.38k | £199.06k | £126.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 April 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 25TH MAY 1964 AND SCHEME OF THE 14TH JANUARY 1970
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPAR (UK) LTD
HYGEIA BUILDING
66-68 COLLEGE ROAD
HARROW
HA1 1BE
- Phone:
- 02084263670
- Email:
- michelle.geraghty@spar.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window