DEXAM TRUST

Charity number: 236265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust makes grants to charitable organisations but concentrates on charities mainly in the West Sussex area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,867
Total expenditure: £16,894

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY EXTON GARDNER Chair
None on record
Roger Temple Morgan-Grenville Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Bryony Dyer Trustee 19 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.12k £6.92k £5.16k £3.68k £4.87k
Total expenditure £2.50k £10.70k £4.20k £6.22k £16.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOLMBUSH WAY
MIDHURST
WEST SUSSEX
GU29 9HE
Phone:
01730811836
Website:

No information available