Financial history ELIZABETH HINTON

Charity number: 236287
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/12/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £18 £20 £18 £18 £18
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A