WREXHAM AND DISTRICT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve, either generally or individually, persons resident in "the area of benefit" who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wrexham
Governance
- 08 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN PAUL SMITH | Chair | 17 March 2015 |
|
|||||
GARY ASHWORTH BROWN | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
VENERABLE HAYLEY DEBORAH YESHUA MATTHEWS | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARIE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Huyton | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|||||
PHILLIP RAYMOND WYNN | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|||||
REV DR JASON STEPHEN BRAY MA, PH.D | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Veronica Partington | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £17.85k | £19.61k | £18.86k | £19.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.08k | £12.18k | £23.93k | £17.29k | £17.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 AUGUST 1974
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE FORMER BOROUGH OF WREXHAM AND THE COMMUNITIES OF ABENBURY, BERSHAM, BIESTON, BROUGHTON, BRYMBO, ESCLUSHAM ABOVE, ESCLUSHAM BELOW, GRESFORD, GWERSYLLT AND MINERA IN THE COUNTY OF CLWYD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2
Mayfield Court
WREXHAM
WREXHAM
LL11 2TN
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- CLERK.WPEF@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window