Accounts and annual returns THE GATEWAY CENTRE (LTD )

Charity Number: 236373
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 02 February 2011 30 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2010 17 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2010 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2009 03 February 2010 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2009 02 March 2010 90 days late