Financial history THE SOCIETY OF ARCHITECTURAL HISTORIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 236432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £178.89k £102.11k £87.57k £112.05k £112.58k
Total expenditure £229.52k £160.08k £164.72k £112.60k £141.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A