THE SOCIETY OF ARCHITECTURAL HISTORIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the study and advance the knowledge of the history and development of architecture. The Society publishes the journal "Architectural History", funds PhD students, makes research and publication grants, and arranges symposia, an Architectural History Workshop for graduate students, and study visits to places of architectural interest (including an annual residential field conference).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 August 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Darling | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Fernandez-Gonzalez | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alistair Fair | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Cattell | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Entwistle | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanvir Hasan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Doreen Bernath | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luca Jellinek | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Elizabeth Hazel McKlellar | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann-Marie Akehurst | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.89k | £102.11k | £87.57k | £112.05k | £112.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.52k | £160.08k | £164.72k | £112.60k | £141.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH JUNE 1964 as amended on 09 Nov 2021 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is to further the study and advance the knowledge of the history and development of architecture in Great Britain and elsewhere.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Cowcross St
LONDON
London
London
London
EC1M 6EL
- Phone:
- 0207251555
- Email:
- info@sahgb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window