Trustees THE SOCIETY OF ARCHITECTURAL HISTORIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN
Charity number: 236432

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Darling | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Fernandez-Gonzalez | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alistair Fair | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Cattell | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Entwistle | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanvir Hasan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Doreen Bernath | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luca Jellinek | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Elizabeth Hazel McKlellar | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann-Marie Akehurst | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.