BECKENHAM THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE THEATRICAL ARTS, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE THEATRICAL ARTS, BY THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS, PROJECTS AND ORGANISATIONS, WORKING TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 January 1967: Standard registration
- BECKENHAM THEATRE (Working name)
- BECKENHAM THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET KATHLEEN GLENN | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
FIONA VAIL | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SAVILL | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JUSTINE ZOE GILMOUR | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Garraway | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Jones | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DARBON | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.27k | £22.17k | £1.23m | £3.47k | £38.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.20k | £9.75k | £22.03k | £10.78k | £4.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £1.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £3.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £76 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.22m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £21.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £600 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £347 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2023 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE THEATRICAL ARTS, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE THEATRICAL ARTS, BY THE AWARDING OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS, PROJECTS AND ORGANISATIONS, WORKING TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BECKENHAM AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pond House
Egerton Road
Charing Heath
TN27 0AX
- Phone:
- 07747 858600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window