Financial history THE BROTHERS OF THE FIRST ORDER OF THE SOCIETY OF ST FRANCIS

Charity number: 236464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £880.25k £712.63k £1.31m £1.06m £1.15m
Total expenditure £851.46k £898.66k £825.12k £827.17k £870.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.94k £28.11k £104.02k N/A £22.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £746.87k £416.66k £1.08m £687.43k £881.35k
Income - Other trading activities £37.79k £24.68k £35.46k £36.66k £32.89k
Income - Charitable activities £8.36k £17.11k £13.68k £9.84k £7.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.48k £50.03k £51.70k £50.36k £98.65k
Income - Other £47.74k £204.15k £131.92k £280.35k £126.91k
Income - Legacies £219.16k £165.00k £438.35k £198.97k £183.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £836.46k £893.11k £813.24k £818.46k £849.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.53k £5.55k £11.88k £8.72k £21.12k
Expenditure - Governance £24.33k £14.91k £34.60k £34.95k £39.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £61.44k £58.46k £48.12k £21.50k £16.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £747 £2.82k £0 £7.04k
Expenditure - Other £474 £0 £0 £0 £0