Trustees THE BROTHERS OF THE FIRST ORDER OF THE SOCIETY OF ST FRANCIS
Charity number: 236464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Br Alf Micael Carlstrom SSF | Chair | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Cristian Buliga SSF | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Hugh Cobbett | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Nicholas Alan Worssam | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Richard Sydney Double SSF | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Benedict Winsper SSF | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Br Peter Zeltins SSF | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Br Malcolm Fountain SSF | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Br David Lanstrom SSF | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Br John Richard Hennings SSF | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Br James Mohun Yonge SSF | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Br Martin Price SSF | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Br Christopher John SSF | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.