J L HANSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 236482
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mainly concerned with the training and education of young people and people with special needs/disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018

Total income: £2
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1964: Standard registration
  • 23 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £2 £2 £2 £2 £2
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 21 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required