THE KINGSTON UPON HULL CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hull Civic Society monitors and comments on planning applications and aims to encourage high standards of design in new buildings and the conservation of historic buildings and those which contribute positively to the city's townscape. It holds public meetings October to April, summer guided walks and visits, provides a3 Newsletters a year and Update planning reports for members on email.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 02 October 1964: Standard registration
- HULL CIVIC SOCIETY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID SCOTNEY | Chair | 13 March 1978 |
|
|
||||
Charles Julian Trafford | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Clare Tracy | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Green | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM VICTOR SHARMAN | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Keith Wolstencroft | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ian Pearson | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS C J FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.26k | £17.74k | £2.36k | £2.27k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.45k | £14.31k | £2.22k | £3.69k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 1964. AS AMENDED ON 10 APR 2017 as amended on 17 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
A) HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN KINGSTON UPON HULL AND SURROUNDING AREA. B) PUBLIC INTEREST IN, AND CARE FOR, THE BEAUTY HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF THE CITY AND SURROUNDINGS. C) THE PRESERVATION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
998 HOLDERNESS ROAD
HULL
HU9 4AG
- Phone:
- 01482 377434
- Email:
- pinkhouse1@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window