COTTAGE CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cottage Charitie has undertaken a rolling programme over the next few years of up-dating the cottages owned by the Charity. Double Glazed windown and door have been fitted to Pear Tree Cottage during this finaancial year. General repairs are regularly undertaken.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Light | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Jane Foster | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia West | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julian Marsh | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.38k | £84.10k | £52.05k | £66.72k | £51.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.60k | £49.89k | £59.97k | £79.69k | £49.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 229 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 590 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 590 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
12 September 2024 | 955 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEEDS OF THE 15TH JULY 1801 AND 17TH FEBRUARY 1802. (SEE ALSO LETTER OF 14TH OCTOBER 1913) AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 31 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
COTTAGES TO BE OCCUPIED BY POOR AND DESERVING PERSONS IN CLANVILLE OF CLANFIELD AND WEYHILL IN THE PARISH OF PENTON GRAFTON.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FAIRGROUND
WEYHILL
ANDOVER
HAMPSHIRE
SP11 0QN
- Phone:
- 01264772460
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window