THE BIRSTALL SICK POOR FUND
Charity Number: 236550
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 November 1966: Standard registration
- 10 May 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE BIRSTALL SICK POOR FUND AND ANOTHER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 NOVEMBER 1951 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 8/12/97.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF SOCK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN BIRSTALL OR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BIRSTALL OR NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
RESOLUTION PASSED ON 25 NOVEMBER 1953 AND SCHEME OF 9 SEPTEMBER 1966.
Charitable objects
TO PURCHASE FOOTWEAR FOR POOR AND NEEDY CHILDREN OF BIRSTALL OF THE AGE OF 16 YEARS OR UNDER.
Area of benefit
BIRSTALL
Registration history
- 07 November 1966 : Standard registration
- 10 May 2000 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.