CHARITY OF CHARLOTTE ELIZABETH BLIGH FOR POOR SPINSTERS
Charity number: 236576
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants given to single women living ion the town of Sevenoaks, Kent for the relief of distress or poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income: £40
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 October 1964: Standard registration
- 17 August 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 17 August 2009: Funds transferred to 278904 THE DOROTHY PARROTT MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29 | £33 | £33 | £37 | £40 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 09 December 2008 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 05 March 2008 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 April 2008 | 793 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME - 8/8/1952
Charitable objects
FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF DESERVING SPINSTERS WHO ARE IN A STATE OF POVERTY IN THE TOWN OF SEVENOAKS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEVENOAKS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window