TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BRYN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Gospel of salvation by the grace of God through Christ Jesus through its proclamation. Also, the advancement of education by teaching; the relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability and financial hardship and the advancement of community development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
- Wigan
Governance
- 02 March 1965: Standard registration
- BRYN BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- MANSE HELD IN CONNEXION WITH BRYN BAPTIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert George Stringer | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Davies | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JOHN TITHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.63k | £18.95k | £16.66k | £20.45k | £22.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.55k | £16.45k | £13.85k | £23.85k | £16.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1961.
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OR PASTOR OF BRYN BAPTIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
BRYN
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Brandforth Gardens
Westhoughton
BOLTON
BL5 3ZP
- Phone:
- 01942238845
- Email:
- rg.stringer@virgin.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window