ST PETER'S HOSTEL FOR MEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 23 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Mary Louise Hirst | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev David Way | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Graham Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.34k | £65.58k | £72.68k | £98.94k | £75.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.67k | £81.99k | £50.00k | £66.29k | £71.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 21/12/1922. SCHEME DATED 16/7/1929 AND VARYING SCHEME 30/8/1932
Charitable objects
1) LODGING HOUSE OR A HOSTEL FOR POOR WORKING MEN 2) ANY RESIDUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH B) FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Area of benefit
ST. PETER'S PLYMOUTH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 Beaumaris Road
PLYMOUTH
PL3 5SE
- Phone:
- 01752780675
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window