ROGATE COMBINED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 236611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

the purposes of the charity are for those in need in the parish of rogate with terwick.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £28
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Edward Michael Doyle Chair
JOINT COUNCIL FOR THE PARISHES OF ROGATE WITH TERWICK AND TROTTON WITH CHITHURST
Recently registered
Maxey John Harwood Trustee 27 October 2022
None on record
Stephen Andrew John BERENDT Trustee 27 October 2022
THE ROGATE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY
Received: On time
Laura Craven Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
JOHN RICHARD FIELD Trustee 17 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24 £25 £25 £376 £28
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 11 JULY 1972
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS WITH PREFERENCE GIVEN TO WIDOWS AND ORPHANS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROGATE
Registration history
  • 21 October 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
FYNING LANE
ROGATE
PETERSFIELD
GU31 5EE
Phone:
01730821576
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available