Financial history WILLIAM BERMAN'S TRUST

Charity number: 236697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £141.37k £150.39k £153.58k £174.27k £185.20k
Total expenditure £113.19k £104.70k £109.01k £149.94k £152.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A