SOUTH LONDON LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
South London Liberal Synagogue is a community place of worship and member of Liberal Judaism. We provide religious support, Jewish education, adult community activities to members through Greater London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 December 1969: Standard registration
- SLLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Samson | Chair | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stuart | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Babette Laura Lichtenstein | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stirrat | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael White | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Allan MBE | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoffrey Wolff | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fabrizio Melis | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Harley-Smith | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rory Michael Hutchings | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reuben Comiskey | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Howard-Schiff | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diego Giraldo Casas | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison May Watson | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian William Jacobs | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maya Jaffe | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.67k | £104.68k | £229.67k | £217.91k | £181.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.08k | £108.93k | £117.59k | £252.70k | £209.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF LIBERAL JUAISM, THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, THE CARRYING ON OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND CLASSES AND OTHER RELIGIOUS RITES AND CHARITABLE DUTIES.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
South London Liberal Synagogue
PO Box 14475
LONDON
SW16 1ZW
- Phone:
- 02087694787
- Email:
- office@southlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window