Linked charities CHARITIES ICW CENTRAL BAPTIST CHAPELS
Charity number: 236712
Removed charity
Linked charities
- BENJAMIN TOMKINS THE ELDER
- BENJAMIN TOMKINS THE YOUNGER
- ELIZABETH DEE
- ELIZABETH WINDSMOOR
- ENDOWMENT FUND IN CONNEXION WITH DRAYTON BAPTIST CHAPEL
- ESTHER LANGFORD
- JOHN TOMKINS
- JOHN TOMKINS IN CONNECTION WITH ABINGDON BAPTIST CHURCH
- JOHN TOMKINS IN CONNECTION WITH BAPTIST CHAPEL AT DRAYTON
- JOSEPH BUTLER
- JOSEPH HYDE
- JOSEPH TOMKINS
- MINISTERS LIBRARY
- NICHOLAS WHITBY
- REPAIR FUND IN CONNEXION WITH COTHILL BAPTIST CHAPEL
- SARAH TOMKINS IN CONNEXION WITH DRAYTON BAPTIST CHAPEL
- SARAH TOMKINS IN CONNEXTION WITH ADBINGDON BAPTIST CHAPEL
- THE HOME MISSION FUND
Governing document
WILL PROVED 07 APRIL 1733 AND SCHEME OF 02 AUGUST 1929 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992 DATED 21 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
A RESIDENCE FOR THE MINSTER OF ABINGDON BAPTIST CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ABINGTON.
Registration history
- 19 March 1965 : Standard registration
- 15 February 1994 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.