THE FAREHAM WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant making Charity covering the original Ecclesiastical Area of Fareham. Priority is given to widows of the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Roger Jackson | Chair | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR LOUISE CLUBLEY | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV SALLY ELIZABETH DAVENPORT | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR SARAH PANKHURST | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DELIA ANNE YULE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE THELMA MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA ROSEMARY COGHLAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.65k | £11.65k | £11.68k | £11.27k | £11.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | £10.18k | £12.99k | £10.66k | £14.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 JULY 1969.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST. PETER AND ST PAUL, FAREHAM ST. JOHN FAREHAM, AND HOLY TRINITY, FAREHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WIDOWS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME.)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 OLD TURNPIKE
FAREHAM
PO16 7HA
- Phone:
- 01329235186
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window