THE INLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 236782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust's purpose is the furtherance of charitable religious activities and organisations on an undenominational basis. In the year ending 2017-18 grants were made totalling £265,000, representing 14 grants made.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £371,367
Total expenditure: £322,187

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • INLIGHT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDY HAYWARD Chair
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Summerfield Trustee 07 July 2020
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time
The Truelight Trust
Recently registered
Stephen George Ellis Collins Trustee 11 March 2020
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time
SHIRLEY VENING Trustee 26 February 2018
The Truelight Trust
Recently registered
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time
Jane Ann DUNHAM Trustee 30 June 2015
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time
Sharon Kelly Knight Trustee 03 October 2013
THE TRUEMARK TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £345.30k £314.00k £334.78k £371.93k £371.37k
Total expenditure £454.81k £276.91k £319.26k £259.93k £322.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
P.O.BOX 2
LISS
HAMPSHIRE
ENGLAND
GU33 6YP
Phone:
07970540015
Website:

No information available