THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social and pastoral work Operation of residential and care establishments Caring for members of the Congregation Overseas Missionary Work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,939,627
Donations and legacies | £2.50m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £728.23k | |
Other | £711.39k |
Total expenditure:
£38,894,776
Raising funds | £123.73k | |
Charitable activities | £38.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,339,281 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £123.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.77m |
People

103 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 1964: Standard registration
- SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL (Working name)
- CHARITY FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Theresa Tighe | Chair | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Kathleen Kennedy | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Anne Teresa Redmond | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Mary Teresa O'Neill | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Sarah Margaret King-Turner | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Maureen Ann Tinkler | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
SISTER KATHLEEN HARTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09m | £8.82m | £4.68m | £2.78m | £3.99m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.16m | £10.90m | £17.32m | £7.90m | £38.89m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £102.14k | £99.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.52m | £2.21m | £2.02m | £1.94m | £2.50m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.57m | £5.68m | £1.55m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £967.67k | £773.58k | £738.45k | £699.17k | £728.23k | |
|
Income - Other | £36.02k | £157.95k | £367.57k | £140.38k | £711.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £354.48k | £93.95k | £15.48k | £57.79k | £730.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.07m | £10.75m | £17.16m | £7.76m | £38.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £93.87k | £152.44k | £163.61k | £148.75k | £123.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £116.87k | £71.52k | £146.07k | £58.17k | £131.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £201.83k | £392.67k | £2.22m | £0 | £633.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £93.87k | £152.44k | £163.61k | £148.75k | £123.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.73m | £15.29m | £10.53m | £10.36m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £35.21m | £37.52m | £40.83m | £31.37m | £9.20m | |
|
Other assets | £4.36m | £4.02m | £2.95m | £2.19m | £50.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £701.86k | £795.65k | £8.27m | £6.63m | £5.53m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 05/06/1964 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/12/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/06/1997 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 13/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESENT TRUSTEES DO AND THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST PROPERTY AND OF THE INCOME OF THE TRUST PROPERTY UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME EITHER AS CAPITAL OR INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PROVINCE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT: (1) THE TRUST PROPERTY AND THE INCOME THEREOF SHALL NOT BE APPLICABLE TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PROVINCE WHICH THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL CONSIDER SHOULD BE ADVANCED BY THE USE OF OTHER ASSETS (2) IF AT ANY TIME THE COMMUNITY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK IN THE PROVINCE THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE”.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROVINCIAL HOUSE
THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
NW7 1RE
- Phone:
- 02089063777
- Email:
- secretariat@dcmillhill.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window