THE DUNKIRK WAR MEMORIAL TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide premises and facilities for the benefit of seafarers in the port of Dunkirk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- France
Governance
- 04 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ijeoma Ajibade | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Eileen Reilly | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN COCKROFT | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tomilayo Toluhi | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.06k | £177.59k | £225.20k | £3.75k | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.75k | £228.43k | £250.27k | £1.40k | £155 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBER 1922 AND AMENDED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AT DUNKIRK A MEMORIAL OF THE GREAT WAR 1914-1918 AND TO PERPETUATE THE MEMORY OF BRITISH SEAMEN WHO SERVED THEIR COUNTRY THEREIN.
Area of benefit
FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Missions to Seafarers
St. Michael Paternoster Royal
College Hill
London
EC4R 2RL
- Phone:
- 02072485202
- Email:
- dwmt@missiontoseafarers.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window