THE SMEATHARPE ALLOTMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish allotments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 18 September 1964: Standard registration
- ALLOTMENT FOR LABOURING POOR (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pat Carter | Chair | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Appleyard | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ty Gunter | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Salmon | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE RAVENSCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR JOHN CORNISH | Trustee |
|
||||||
TRISTAN PIKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDWIN JOHN BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/03/2020 | 24/03/2021 | 24/03/2022 | 24/03/2023 | 24/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £582 | £557 | £573 | £585 | £727 | |
|
Total expenditure | £478 | £521 | £577 | £535 | £506 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD OF 19/1/1855. REPORT ON DEVON CHARITIES VOL. 6 P.327)
Charitable objects
AN ALLOTMENT FOR THE LABOURING POOR OF THE PARISH OF UPOTTERY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF UPOTTERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD
SCHOOL HOUSE
SMEATHARPE
HONITON
EX14 9RF
- Phone:
- 07711267697
- Email:
- grahamglong@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window