STURTON AND STOW AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise, run and promote an annual agricultural and horticultural show. The purpose of the show is to promote education and friendly competition in the areas of agriculture, horticulture, arts and handicrafts. The Show is open to all age groups and most classes are open to entrants, wherever they live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 September 1964: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- STURTON AND STOW SHOW COMMITTEE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02k | £2.08k | £1.86k | £2.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £1.56k | £1.75k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 07 March 2011 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND RULES (AS PUBLISHED ANNUALLY IN SHOW SCHEDULES)
Charitable objects
PROMOTION AND FOSTERING OF INTEREST IN AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE AND STAGING OF SHOWS BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY. (FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE RULES)
Area of benefit
STURTON AND STOW AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window