Financial history PARISH LANDS

Charity Number: 236835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/10/2019 16/10/2020 16/10/2021 16/10/2022 16/10/2023
Total gross income £1.61k £1.61k £1.97k £1.99k £1.99k
Total expenditure £1.43k £1.43k £1.83k £2.21k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A