PHILIP STANYERS AND OTHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pay yearly Doles to Elderly Persons of long Residence in Parish of Kingsbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 24 January 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Bates | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Elizabeth Thomas | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Revd.Dr John Christopher White | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Andrew Roy Jenns | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Councillor Hayden Albert Phillips | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CERIDWEN MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT DIX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £1.77k | £1.79k | £1.83k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.55k | £1.47k | £2.03k | £1.77k | £3.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 3RD DECEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF KINGSBURY AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 11TH MAY 1909 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KINGSBURY AS CONSTITUTED ON 11TH MAY 1909
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 WOOD STREET
WOOD END
ATHERSTONE
CV9 2QJ
- Phone:
- 01827872458
- Email:
- annlewis0224@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window