HUTTON RUDBY VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall and recreation ground for use by the inhabitants of Hutton Rudby and the surrounding neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 November 1964: Standard registration
- HUTTON RUDBY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Voke | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Christopher Hepburn | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Hunter | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Leslie Granville | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Butler | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STANLEY BLACK | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Valerie Devereux | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Simpson | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AUTHERSON | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||
DENISE ROBERTSON | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.34k | £28.20k | £19.58k | £30.25k | £28.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.14k | £33.67k | £30.31k | £39.32k | £40.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17TH SEPTEMBER 2001 WILL GOV THE CHY. as amended on 09 May 2018 as amended on 22 May 2023
Charitable objects
IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RESERVATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HUTTON RUDBY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 West Green
Stokesley
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS9 5BD
- Phone:
- 07710030461
- Email:
- cfarman29@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window