FAWCETT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make donations only to other charities. Our annual accounts contain a list of our beneficiaries in that year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 October 1964: Standard registration
- P E S FAWCETT CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
XAVIER AXEL REHMAN-FAWCETT | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julian Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 11 December 2002 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRISTOPHER ARNAUD SANDFORD | Trustee | 22 November 1971 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.52k | £23.09k | £69.47k | £25.72k | £30.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.47k | £28.01k | £24.32k | £30.86k | £25.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2024
(These accounts |
09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT 28TH JULY 1964
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PERSONS OR BODY INCORPORATE OR CORPORATE WHICH IS FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION. FAILURE TO APPLY AS ABOVE FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE SOCIETY OF JESUS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILDERSHAM HALL
HILDERSHAM
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 6BU
- Phone:
- 07810 056548
- Email:
- julian.tunnicliffe@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window