WELLS NEXT THE SEA UNITED CHARITIES(CHARITY NO 236897)INCORPORATING FORMER CHARITY NO (259709)(WELLS AND DISTRICT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 21 October 1964: Standard registration
- UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- WELLS NEXT THE SEA UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- WELLS NEXT THE SEA UNITED CHARITIES. (REGISTERED CHARITY NO 236897 INCORPORATING THE FORMER CHARITY NO 259709 KNOWN AS WELLS AND DISTRICT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMELDA CRACKNELL | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ceridwen Howell | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wild | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HARDMAN | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN SWIFT | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Pigney | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGUERITE PATTRICK | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN GAYNOR DAVIES | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL ANNE CRAWFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.73k | £9.10k | £163.06k | £43.72k | £40.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12k | £31.18k | £48.85k | £13.73k | £29.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 18 JULY 1876, 12 MAY 1898 AND 24 MAY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05 AUG 2019 as amended on 17 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE ELDERLY TO INCLUDE, RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH, DISABILITY AND OLD AGE, IN THE COMMUNITY, BY THE PROVISION OF: A) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE B) FACILITIES, AMENITIES, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, AND SERVICES ‘THE COMMUNITY’ MEANS THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA WITHIN THE ALDERMAN PEEL HIGH SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA.
Area of benefit
THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA WITHIN THE ALDERMAN PEEL HIGH SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA.
Linked charities
- 21 October 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Theatre Road
WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA
NR23 1DS
- Phone:
- 01328 710347
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window