THE ABERFORD ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The letting and upkeep of almshouses to elderly people of good character who have resided in the surrounding area for not less than two years preceding the time of application.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Robbins | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Griffiths | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR Ryan Stephenson | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH REED | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE HASSELL | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRIS WILTON | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.62k | £138.15k | £150.85k | £152.36k | £148.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.34k | £101.24k | £113.42k | £107.99k | £115.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 JULY 1913 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26 JULY 1960.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFITS OF EIGHT ALMSPEOPLE BEING POOR PERSON OF GOOD CHARACTER NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE TOWNSHIPS OF PARLINGTON, ABERFORD, LOTHERTON, GARFORTH, SHERBURN, CHURCH FENTON, BARKSTON, SOUTH MILFORD, SAXTON OR BARWICK FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parlington House
Beech View
Aberford
LEEDS
LS25 3BX
- Phone:
- 0113 281 3763
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window