ROYAL WINDSOR ROSE AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities related to horticulture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 16 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW TRY | Chair | 19 April 2011 |
|
|||||
John Anderson | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Rebecca SWan | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Adamson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Richards | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Goolden Astles | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.54k | £6.63k | £90.43k | £125.19k | £144.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.98k | £991 | £79.58k | £106.78k | £118.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 9TH JUNE 1964
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE CARITABLE ONLY AND SHALL INCLUDE THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE OF, AND INTEREST IN, THE SCIENCE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
WINDSOR AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
364 HIGH ST
HARLINGTON
HAYES
MIDDLESEX
UB3 5LF
- Phone:
- 02088976345
- Email:
- rwrhsshow@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window