Accounts and annual returns MENWITH-CUM-DARLEY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 236944
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 February 2010 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required