THE COMMUNITY OF ST EDMUND OF THE ENGLISH CONGREGATION OF THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT ESTABLISHED AT DOUAI ABBEY, WOOLHAMPTON, BERKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Douai Abbey is a community of Benedictine monks who are involved in educational, pastoral and other work. The main pastoral activity consists of welcoming guests who come for retreats and conferences, in groups or as individuals. The Abbey Church and the other facilities are also used by other organisations, both religious and secular, for their own meetings and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£597,883
Donations and legacies | £221.72k | |
Charitable activities | £162.93k | |
Other trading activities | £10.15k | |
Investments | £191.08k | |
Other | £12.00k |
Total expenditure:
£1,078,534
Raising funds | £77.82k | |
Charitable activities | £1.00m | |
Other | £0 |
-£310,584 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £77.82k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.00m |
People

15 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 09 November 1965: Standard registration
- DOUAI ABBEY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL GUNTER OSB | Chair | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Francis Hughes OSB | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
REV Stephen Wilson OSB | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
REV THOMAS HOLT OSB | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew SOMERVILLE KNAPMAN OSB | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £711.25k | £610.60k | £483.21k | £634.06k | £597.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06m | £901.19k | £795.81k | £932.93k | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.14k | £55.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £316.36k | £257.96k | N/A | £303.75k | £221.72k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £30.09k | £10.89k | N/A | £8.32k | £10.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £173.98k | £127.68k | N/A | £128.60k | £162.93k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £177.97k | £148.45k | N/A | £181.40k | £191.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £12.85k | £65.62k | N/A | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.54k | £36.42k | N/A | £67.39k | £14.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £998.59k | £841.41k | N/A | £865.59k | £1.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £64.77k | £59.78k | N/A | £67.35k | £77.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £84.88k | £29.83k | N/A | £37.78k | £23.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.23k | £50.07k | N/A | £61.77k | £59.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.91m | £6.72m | N/A | £6.37m | £6.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.93m | £8.27m | N/A | £9.35m | £8.92m | |
|
Other assets | £199.94k | £201.86k | N/A | £296.37k | £174.90k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £45.79k | £34.59k | N/A | £39.67k | £50.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1934.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 09 November 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOUAI ABBEY
UPPER WOOLHAMPTON
READING
RG7 5TQ
- Phone:
- 01189715300
- Email:
- bursar@douaiabbey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window