Financial history THE SHEFFIELD FORGEMASTERS LIMITED BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 236986
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £0 £8.32k £13.76k £14.67k £20.53k
Total expenditure £3.00k £35.23k £3.22k £11.14k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A