MRS HOWARD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Hall used exclusively by voluntary organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORTH HERTS DISTRICT COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.56k | £5.60k | £5.57k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £501.11k | £53.13k | £57.81k | £56.29k | £54.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2025 | 1096 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/8/1964
Charitable objects
(A) TO HOLD MRS. HOWARD MEMORIAL HALL FOR USE AS A HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LETCHWORTH AND DISTRICT AS A PLACE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND AS THE TRUSTEE MAY THINK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO HOLD THE ADJOINING YOUTH CLUB BUILDING FOR USE AS A CLUBHOUSE FOR A YOUTH CLUB OR OTHER CLUB OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER
Area of benefit
LETCHWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRS HOWARD MEMORIAL HALL
NORTON WAY SOUTH
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
HERTFORDSHIRE
SG6 1NX
- Phone:
- 01462474000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window