THE SANDY CHARITIES

Charity number: 237145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 June 2024

Total income: £10,767
Total expenditure: £12,661

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE ANN HAYGARTH Chair 10 June 2014
None on record
Rev Jodie Natasha Brown Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Benjamin Bardell Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Colin Osborne Trustee 24 June 2016
THE LEPROSY MISSION INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, SANDY
Received: On time
KAREN HAYWARD Trustee 18 September 2015
None on record
PAUL JOHN SHARMAN Trustee 08 June 2015
The Methodist Church - Letchworth Garden City
Received: On time
MR. JONATHAN PYM Trustee
THE RICKFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTINE SUMMERFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/06/2020 09/06/2021 09/06/2022 09/06/2023 09/06/2024
Total gross income £9.79k £9.72k £8.24k £12.05k £10.77k
Total expenditure £6.08k £5.59k £16.87k £14.75k £12.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 June 2024 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 09 June 2023 07 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 09 June 2022 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 June 2021 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 June 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 12 SEPTEMBER 1961 AS VARIED BY RESOLUTION UNDER SEC 2 C.A. 1985, COMMISSIONERS GAVE NOTICE OF CONCURRENCE ON 19 AUGUST 1987
Charitable objects
INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SANDY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SANDY
Registration history
  • 09 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
19 THE GREEN
BEESTON
SANDY
SG19 1PE
Phone:
01767680251
Website:

No information available