Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF SIR FRANCIS BOTELER

Charity number: 237189
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 24 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 19 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 24 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 24 August 2011 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 01 December 2010 On Time