THE LADY GRACE JAMES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grants to organisations in Ceredigion which are for the benefit of the elderly in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 16 October 1964: Standard registration
- YMDDIRIEDOLAETH GOFFA Y FONESIG GRACE JAMES (Working name)
- THE LADY GRACE JAMES MEMORIAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CYNG GARETH DAVIES | Chair | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mair Nutting | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Davies | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Thomas | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEULWEN LEWIS | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALED MEDWYN EVANS | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beti Griffiths | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.10k | £11.50k | £14.40k | £8.40k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.23k | £11.40k | £14.53k | £8.52k | £9.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 31 JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER ABERYSTWYTH RURAL DISTRICT AND THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ABERYSTWYTH.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Crugyn Dimai
Rhydyfelin
Aberystwyth
SY23 4PR
- Phone:
- 01970611691
- Email:
- rhian.crugyn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window